Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
All Interested Parties filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryProbate - Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice to Creditors | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Prove Up (3:50 PM) (Judicial Officer Copeland, Weldon S) LT LT |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Admit Letters Testamentary & Issue Letters | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Death | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Oath | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Attorney Correspondence Letter | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Last Will & Testament Original Original |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Return | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Abstract for Application Voters Registration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.