Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hill, Norelia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Russell R. Reynolds, against Zoe'S Kitchen Usa Llc, represented by Patrick F Madden, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Bouressa, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBouressa, Andrea Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Case Disposed 12/05/2022 Reset by Court to 08/21/2023 Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order DWOP DWOP Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) 12/01/2022 Reset by Court to 08/17/2023
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Defendant Zoe's Kitchen, USA LLC D/B/A Zoes Kitchen's Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Norelia Hill Order Order on Defendant Zoe's Kitchen, USA LLC D/B/A Zoes Kitchen's Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff Norelia Hill Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediation Action Letter Regarding Successful Mediation Letter Regarding Successful Mediation Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Per Attorney CANCELED Motion for Summary Judgment (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Per Attorney by submission- Defendant's Motion for Partial No-Evidence Summary Judgment Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Regarding Deposition by Written Questions - CVS Pharmacy Certificate of Deposition (Bill of Cost Form) Regarding Deposition by Written Questions - CVS Pharmacy Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.