Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Armstrong, Jesse, Jr., Gibbons, Brandi Marie, filed a(n) Civil Transfer In From Another County case represented by Derrel Luce, against Abf Freight System, Inc., Carlson, Adrian Bryan, Hunt, Cody Ryan, represented by Brett W Levinson, William F Allred, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Bouressa, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBouressa, Andrea Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Transfer In From Another County |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Order to Dismiss CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Order to Dismiss Dispositive Orders due Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Brandi Mariegibbons' Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice Plaintiff Brandi Mariegibbons' Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Brandi Marie Gibbons' Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice Plaintiff Brandi Marie Gibbons' Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Case Settled Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Case Settled CANCELED Pre Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Case Settled Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mediation Action Settled Settled Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Notice Notice of Settlement Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Business Records and CPRC 18.001 Affidavits Notice Notice of Service Business Records and CPRC 18.001 Affidavits Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.