Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Washington, Jaylon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rocio Gosewehr Hernandez, against Bhalgami, Chirag, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Bouressa, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBouressa, Andrea Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Non-Suit CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Non-Suit Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Order of Nonsuit Order of Nonsuit Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Cover Letter Cover Letter Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Return Affidavit of Service - Chirag Bhalgami Affidavit of Service - Chirag Bhalgami Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Bhalgami, Chirag Served 02/02/2021 Returned 02/08/2021
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $371.00 Plaintiff's Original Petition and First Set of Written Discovery Plaintiff's Original Petition and First Set of Written Discovery Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00 Plaintiff's Original Petition and First Set of Written Discovery Plaintiff's Original Petition and First Set of Written Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.