Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
City Of Murphy, Collin County, Collin County Ccd, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Tracy A Pounders, against Uy Do, Wes, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Bouressa, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryTax Cases - District |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Order to Nonsuit Order to Nonsuit Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Non-Suit CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bouressa, Andrea) Non-Suit Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter requesting payment for Court Cost and Title Search Letter Letter requesting payment for Court Cost and Title Search Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation by Certified Mail $83.00
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Uy Do, Wes Served 10/30/2020 Returned 11/04/2020
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return Unserved-Wes Uy Do Unserved-Wes Uy Do Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Fee #3, $75.00
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.