Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Eldorado Heights Section Ii Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lance Erickson, against Nelson, Memory, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Bouressa, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2019 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Summary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Transfer and Retain Funds Held in Court Registry Order Order Granting Motion to Transfer and Retain Funds Held in Court Registry Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer and Retain Funds Held in Court Registry Motion Motion to Transfer and Retain Funds Held in Court Registry Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed Notice of Funds in Registry of Court Notice of Funds in Registry of Court Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Nelson, Memory Served 06/07/2022
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order of Sale $8.00
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Fee #1, $175.00 Constable Service Fee #1, $175.00 Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return Officer's Return order of Sale - Real Property Officer's Return order of Sale - Real Property Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order of Sale $8.00
Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Fee #1, $175.00 Constable Service Fee #1, $175.00 Judge: Bouressa, Andrea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.