Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ogbuehi, Christal Chisom, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Hardy, Demonta Lashun, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Dukes, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryIv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Establishing Pcr |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Christal Chisom Ogbuehi Christal Chisom Ogbuehi Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mailed Default and Judgment Letters Default and Judgment Letters Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Correspondence (OAG Use Only) Certificate of Last Known Address-Demonta Haryd Certificate of Last Known Address-Demonta Haryd Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dukes, Shelly) Reset from 06/10/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Result: Default Judgment Reset from 06/10/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Correspondence (OAG Use Only) Duplicate Service Return Demonta Lashun Hardy Shows Served Duplicate Service Return Demonta Lashun Hardy Shows Served Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Reset Order (OAG Use Only)
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () Reset from 03/18/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Reset from 03/18/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Reset Order (OAG Use Only)
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () Petition to Establish & Suit Affecting PCR (IV-D Child Support Court) Petition to Establish & Suit Affecting PCR (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Return of Service (OAG Use Only) Demonta Hardy - Unserved Citation Demonta Hardy - Unserved Citation Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.