Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with McCraw, Piper presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Permanent Injunction |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Out of County Service Fee Aldan Anderson-Ferre Aldan Anderson-Ferre Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McCraw, Piper)
Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
App for Protective Ord (OCA) $314.00 Application for Protective Order Application for Protective Order Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Protective Order Anderson-Ferre, Aldan Served 01/03/2019 Returned 01/15/2019
Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
TCIC Form
Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Ex Parte Protective Order $8.00
Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Protective Order Granted. Protective Order Granted. Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order
Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Issued Protective Order (Court Activity)
Judge: McCraw, Piper Party(Anderson-Ferre, Caroline;Â Anderson-Ferre, AldanPermanent Injunction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.