Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Erskine, Donna Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Erskine, Russell Paul, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Davis, Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Agreement Reached CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McCraw, Piper) Agreement Reached Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Austin Form Mailed Mailed Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mailed Notice of Final Decree
Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Divorce Granted. Signed. Divorce Granted. Signed. Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial Before the Court Agreement Reached CANCELED Trial Before the Court (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McCraw, Piper) Agreement Reached Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Action Mediated Settlement Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement
Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order
Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Counter Petition $65.00 Original Counterpetition for Divorce Original Counterpetition for Divorce Judge: Davis, Richard |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Judge: Davis, Richard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.