Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wilson, Patrick Frank, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Heath, Jessica Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Wynne, Lindsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWynne, Lindsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryForeign Judgment For Family |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Before the Court Non-Suit CANCELED Trial Before the Court (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wynne, Lindsey) Non-Suit 2.5 hr/side Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed Order Granting Nonsuit Order Granting Nonsuit Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Nonsuit Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Respondent's Motion for Telephone Testimony or Respondent to Testify Via Zoom Respondent's Motion for Telephone Testimony or Respondent to Testify Via Zoom Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Respondent's Supplemental Response and Special Appearance and Plea to the Jurisdiction Respondent's Supplemental Response and Special Appearance and Plea to the Jurisdiction Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Court's Notice of In-Person Appearance Court's Notice of In-Person Appearance Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Petitioner's Motion to Register Foreign Order and Deny Special Appearance and Brief in Support Petitioner's Motion to Register Foreign Order and Deny Special Appearance and Brief in Support Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Requested Trial Setting CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Wynne, Lindsey) Requested Trial Setting Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order
Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Appearance of Counsel Entry of Appearance of Counsel Entry of Appearance of Counsel Judge: Wynne, Lindsey |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.