Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
H198 Mckinney Ranch Land Llc, Tci Mckinney 34 Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Amy R Sallusti, against Collin Central Appraisal District, represented by Jennifer T Pettit, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Willis, Jill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Before the Court Agreement Reached CANCELED Trial Before the Court (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Willis, Jill) Agreement Reached 2.5 hours/side Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment Letter Judgment Letter Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Agreed Discovery Control Plan/Scheduling Order Entered CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:25 AM) (Judicial Officer Willis, Jill) Agreed Discovery Control Plan/Scheduling Order Entered Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order (Level 1 or 2 - Civil) Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order Discovery Control Plan and Scheduling Order (Level 1 or 2 - Civil) Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Return Sheriff's Return - Collin Central Appraisal District Sheriff's Return - Collin Central Appraisal District Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00
Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Collin Central Appraisal District Served 09/04/2019 Returned 09/18/2019
Judge: Willis, Jill |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00 Plaintiffs' Original Petition Plaintiffs' Original Petition Judge: Willis, Jill |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.