Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Penney, Shannon Glenn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Penney, Krishna Hurley, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Wheless, Cynthia M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Address Change
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheless, Cynthia M)
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry WS/EP Div granted. Decree/s WS/EP Div granted. Decree/s Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Austin Form NOT PROVIDED NOT PROVIDED Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Citation
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Admin - Mailed Notice (Judicial Officer: Wheless, Cynthia M ) DWOP DWOP Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Docket Control - No Appearances Required (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wheless, Cynthia M) Result: Set for Dismissal Docket
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Practical Parenting Education Certificate
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mailed PPE Order
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Requiring Completiton of For Kid's Sake Seminar
Judge: Wheless, Cynthia M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.