Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Victorian, Felita Laureal, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Victorian, Nyesha Nicole, Trask, Jonathan James, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Dukes, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryIv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Adjudication Of Parentage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment Letters Judgment Letters Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing DNA (12:00 PM) () Reset from 03/18/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Reset from 03/18/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Correspondence (OAG Use Only) Copy of Nyesha Victorian's Citation Copy of Nyesha Victorian's Citation Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (12:00 PM) () Petition to Establish PCR (IV-D Child Support Court) Petition to Establish PCR (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Order (OAG Use Only) Order For Parentage Testing Order For Parentage Testing Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Return of Service (OAG Use Only) Nyesha Victorian - Served Citation Nyesha Victorian - Served Citation Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return Felita Victorian - Served Citation Felita Victorian - Served Citation Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Victorian, Nyesha Nicole Served 03/04/2019 Returned 03/11/2019
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Trask, Jonathan James Unserved
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Victorian, Felita Laureal Served 02/08/2019 Returned 02/08/2019
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.