Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raj, Joseph Amal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Raj, Jansi Sagaya, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Thompson, Andrea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Employer's Address Notice Notice of Employer's Address Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Qualified Domestic Relations Order Siemens Savings Plan Siemens Savings Plan Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion to Sign Qualified Domestic Relations Order Agreed Motion to Sign Qualified Domestic Relations Order Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mailed Notice of Final Decree
Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Austin Form Mailed Mailed Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Divorce Prove Up - Docket Entry Divorce Granted Divorce Granted Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Case Disposed CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Thompson, Andrea, Thompson, Andrea) Case Disposed Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order - Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Income Withhold for Child Support- Original Income Withhold Order/ Notice for Support (IWO) Income Withhold for Child Support- Original Income Withhold Order/ Notice for Support (IWO) Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Thompson, Andrea)
Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Biard, Webb |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.