Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martinez, Maximino, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David S Kohm, against Garcia, Otilio Lopez, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with John R. Roach, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn R. Roach, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Default Judgment CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Roach, John R., Jr.) Default Judgment Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment Letter Judgment Letter Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Letter Mailed
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Roach, John R., Jr.)
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Retain Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Retain Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment As To Damages Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment As To Damages Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Case called, parties appeared. DWOP reset to 2/1/23 at 9am Case called, parties appeared. DWOP reset to 2/1/23 at 9am Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Letter Mailed
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed judgment letter judgment letter Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Roach, John R., Jr.)
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.