Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First United Bank And Trust Company, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by James M Orr, against Robinson, Sheldon, Hunter, Stewart, Hr Custom Builders, Llc, Guercio, Thomas, represented by Matthew R Pickelman, William L Siegel, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Biard, Webb presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit Joint Notice of Non- Suit Without Prejudice Joint Notice of Non- Suit Without Prejudice Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Withdrawal of Counsel
Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw
Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Thomas Guercio-Only Thomas Guercio-Only Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Other Papers and Request for Service of Notices and Other Papers Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Declaration Invoking Settlement Offer Provisions Declaration Invoking Settlement Offer Provisions Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cross Action or Claim $80.00 Stewart Hunter's First Amended Cross-Claims against Defendant Thomas Guercio, Sheldon Robinson and Stewart Hunter Stewart Hunter's First Amended Cross-Claims against Defendant Thomas Guercio, Sheldon Robinson and Stewart Hunter Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cross Action or Claim $80.00 Stewart Hunter's Cross-Claims Against Defendant Thomas Guercio Stewart Hunter's Cross-Claims Against Defendant Thomas Guercio Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Special Exceptions and Amended Answer-Def and Amended Answer-Def Judge: Biard, Webb |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Biard, Webb |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.