Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Sli, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Daena G Ramsey, against De Lucio Usa, Rodriguez, Raul, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts 416th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2024 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court House416th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Substituted Service Order Granting Second Motion for Substituted Service (01/12/2024) Order Granting Second Motion for Substituted Service (01/12/2024) |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Citation $8.00 | |
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Staying Case as to Certain Defendants and Claims Pending Arbitration and Severance of Claims (05/21/2024) Agreed Order Agreed Order Staying Case as to Certain Defendants and Claims Pending Arbitration and Severance of Claims (05/21/2024) |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substituted Service Second Motion for Substituted Service: Defendants De Lucio USA and Raul Rodriguez (01/10/2024) Second Motion for Substituted Service: Defendants De Lucio USA and Raul Rodriguez (01/10/2024) |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation De Lucio USA Unserved Rodriguez, Raul Unserved | |
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Return Citation - De Lucio USA - Served (01/25/2024) Citation - De Lucio USA - Served (01/25/2024) |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (Comment) Plaintiff SLI, INC.'s Original Petition (10/18/2023) Plaintiff SLI, INC.'s Original Petition (10/18/2023) |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Return Citation - Raul Rodriguez - Served (01/25/2024) Citation - Raul Rodriguez - Served (01/25/2024) |
|
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substituted Service: Defendants De Lucio USA and Raul Rodriguez (11/22/2023) Motion for Substituted Service Motion for Substituted Service: Defendants De Lucio USA and Raul Rodriguez (11/22/2023) |
|
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $371.00 Re: Letter request new severed cause from case 416-06296-2023 Re: Letter request new severed cause from case 416-06296-2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.