Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Old Other Civil Cases - District case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryOld Other Civil Cases - District |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion CONVIENCE FEE - 051506 CONVIENCE FEE - 051506 |
|
May 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Notice of Dismissal 6/10/06 RMVD Notice of Dismissal 6/10/06 RMVD |
|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ORDEROF DSMSL W/O PREJ- SIGNED ORDEROF DSMSL W/O PREJ- SIGNED |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MTN FOR NONSUIT W/O PREJUDICE MTN FOR NONSUIT W/O PREJUDICE |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion E-FILING CONVENIENCE FEE E-FILING CONVENIENCE FEE |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion E-FILING CONVENIENCE FEE E-FILING CONVENIENCE FEE |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.