Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Old Other Civil Cases - District case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryOld Other Civil Cases - District |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion S/R ORD OF SALE FRED CANTU 050206 S/R ORD OF SALE FRED CANTU 050206 |
|
March 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ISSUED 1 ORD OF SALE TO BELL ISSUED 1 ORD OF SALE TO BELL |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion REQ ORDER OF SALE W/SERV REQ ORDER OF SALE W/SERV |
|
February 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ISSUED/MLD ABSTRACT TO ATTY IN SASE ISSUED/MLD ABSTRACT TO ATTY IN SASE |
|
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT REQUEST FOR ABSTRACT |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
February 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MLD DEFAULT LTR TO FRED MLD DEFAULT LTR TO FRED |
|
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion PL'S MOTION F/ENTRY OF DEFLT JDGMNT PL'S MOTION F/ENTRY OF DEFLT JDGMNT |
|
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SGND DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SGND |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion S/R CIT FRED CANTU 010406 S/R CIT FRED CANTU 010406 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.