Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Rusch, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryIv-D Support Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Holding Respondent In Contempt |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Withdrawal of Counsel
Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Case called, no response. MJR Case called, no response. MJR Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rusch, Mark)
Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Letter Cover Letter - Motion to Withdraw with 10-day notice for objections before entry Cover Letter - Motion to Withdraw with 10-day notice for objections before entry Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign Order on Motion for Enforcement to Sign Order on Motion for Enforcement Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Sign Notice Notice of Hearing on Motion to Sign Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enforcement (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rusch, Mark)
Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rusch, Mark)
Judge: Rusch, Mark |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Testimony taken. Def found in Motion in Contempt Sustained. Respondent found guilty of contempt and punishment is assessed at confinement in the County Jail of Collin County for ___180 days______________ and a fine of $____0____________, together with court costs accruing in this proceeding. The confinement to continue until Respondent has purged himself by paying arrearage in the sum of $___7122.00 (less $2000.00 that has been paid but not received yet)________________. Commitment suspended on condition Respondent pays __$500.00 per month toward current child support and arrearages (total)______________________________________________________________________________________. Testimony taken. Def found in Motion in Contempt Sustained. Respondent found guilty of contempt and punishment is assessed at confinement in the County Jail of Collin County for ___180 days______________ and a fine of $____0____________, together with court costs accruing in this proceeding. The confinement to continue until Respondent has purged himself by paying arrearage in the sum of $___7122.00 (less $2000.00 that has been paid but not received yet)________________. Commitment suspended on condition Respondent pays __$500.00 per month toward current child support and arrearages (total)______________________________________________________________________________________. Judge: Rusch, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.