Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nugent, Kylee Rae, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Zarate Sifuentes, Emir Alejandro, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Dukes, Shelly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryIv-D Support Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable Returned Notice of Nonsuit - Undeliverable Returned Notice of Nonsuit - Undeliverable Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mailed Notice Of Nonsuit Notice Of Nonsuit Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dukes, Shelly) Reset from 07/18/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Result: Nonsuit Reset from 07/18/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return Kylee Nugent - Unserved Citation Kylee Nugent - Unserved Citation Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Nugent, Kylee Rae Returned Unserved 09/03/2019 Returned 09/03/2019
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
AG Citation $8.00 (OAG Use Only) Kylee Rae Nugent Kylee Rae Nugent Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (12:00 PM) () Reset from 06/10/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Reset from 06/10/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Constable Service Return Kylee Nugent - Unserved Citation Kylee Nugent - Unserved Citation Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () Reset from 03/14/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Reset from 03/14/19 (IV-D Child Support Court) Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Nugent, Kylee Rae Returned Unserved 06/28/2019 Returned 06/28/2019
Judge: Dukes, Shelly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.