Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holly E Fuller filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Charles F. Sandoval presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles F. Sandoval Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryOld - All Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MCKINNEY PD MCKINNEY PD |
|
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion SENT CERT COPY OF ORD TO CCSO AND SENT CERT COPY OF ORD TO CCSO AND |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion PROTECTIVE ORDER-SIGNED PROTECTIVE ORDER-SIGNED |
|
January 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sandoval, Charles F.) TPO TPO |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion S/R TRO BOYSIE TRUST 1-3-06 S/R TRO BOYSIE TRUST 1-3-06 |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ISS EXP P/O RET TO BUCKET ISS EXP P/O RET TO BUCKET |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion TEMP EXPARTE PROT ORD-SIGNED TEMP EXPARTE PROT ORD-SIGNED |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion EX PARTE TEMP PROT ORDER W/SERV #1 EX PARTE TEMP PROT ORDER W/SERV #1 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.