Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcintire, Judy G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcintire, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Sandoval, Charles F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandoval, Charles F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryOld - Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeNunc Pro Tunc Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Smith, Benjamin N., District Judge, 380th) Nunc Pro Tunc Nunc Pro Tunc Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies $
Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Order Nunc Pro Tunc Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on Motion for Order Nunc Pro Tunc Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order Nunc Pro Tunc Motion Motion for Order Nunc Pro Tunc Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion 1 CERT COPY 1 CERT COPY Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sandoval, Charles F.) TBC RMVD TBC RMVD Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion AGREED DECREE OF DIVORCE SGND AGREED DECREE OF DIVORCE SGND Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ORD ON MOT FOR W/D OF COUNSEL SGND ORD ON MOT FOR W/D OF COUNSEL SGND Judge: Sandoval, Charles F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.