Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conversion Entry filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryOld - Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Copies $ | |
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Copies $ | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer White , Nathan ) PROVE UP PROVE UP |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SD FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE SD |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion WAIVER OF SERVICE WAIVER OF SERVICE |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion PETITION FOR DIVORCE PETITION FOR DIVORCE |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion COPIES 3 PAGES COPIES 3 PAGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.