Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conversion Entry filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2005 |
CategoryOld - Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion DC/PROVE UP 1/26/07 REMOVED DC/PROVE UP 1/26/07 REMOVED |
|
January 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion DECREE OF DIVORCE-SD DECREE OF DIVORCE-SD |
|
January 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer White , Nathan ) TBC/RMVD JCS 1/16/07 TBC/RMVD JCS 1/16/07 |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion 3 PAGES 3 PAGES |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion REQUEST FOR CITATION-NO SERVICE REQUEST FOR CITATION-NO SERVICE |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ISSUED 1 CIT TO FRONT ISSUED 1 CIT TO FRONT |
|
October 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ORDER ON MOT FOR ALTERNATIVE SRVS-SIGNED ORDER ON MOT FOR ALTERNATIVE SRVS-SIGNED |
|
October 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE |
|
October 31, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MFUR: CASE REINSTATED MFUR: CASE REINSTATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.