Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Old Other Civil Cases - District case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2005 |
CategoryOld Other Civil Cases - District |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion SENT DEFAULT LTR TO DEF. SENT DEFAULT LTR TO DEF. |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DEFAULT JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MOT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGEMENT MOT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGEMENT |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion 12-28-05 | |
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion S/R CIT/CHRISTOPHER MACFARLAND/ S/R CIT/CHRISTOPHER MACFARLAND/ |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion FRT. CT. FRT. CT. |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion ISSUED CIT/C.MACFARLAND/RET'D ISSUED CIT/C.MACFARLAND/RET'D |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion COPIES 19 PAGES COPIES 19 PAGES |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion REQUEST FOR CITATION-NO SERVICE REQUEST FOR CITATION-NO SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.