Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conversion Entry filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Greg Brewer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGreg Brewer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2005 |
CategoryCivil Old - Accounts, Contracts, Notes |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion STATUS/SETTLEMENT PAPERS DUE 5/18/07 RMV STATUS/SETTLEMENT PAPERS DUE 5/18/07 RMV |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion AGRD ORDER OF DISMISSAL- SIGNED AGRD ORDER OF DISMISSAL- SIGNED |
|
April 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion JOINT MOT TO DISMISS JOINT MOT TO DISMISS |
|
April 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion JURY TRIAL/RMVD JCS 4/30/07 (SETTLED) JURY TRIAL/RMVD JCS 4/30/07 (SETTLED) |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion PL 1ST AMND PET/RULE 194 DISCLOSURE PL 1ST AMND PET/RULE 194 DISCLOSURE |
|
April 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion REQ REQ |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brewer, Greg) DEFT'S M/CONTINUE DEFT'S M/CONTINUE |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion OD GRTG DF MT TO EXCLUDE EXP TESTIMONY-S OD GRTG DF MT TO EXCLUDE EXP TESTIMONY-S |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conversion Entry (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Brewer, Greg) DEFT'S M/EXCLUDE P'S AFFIDAVITS DEFT'S M/EXCLUDE P'S AFFIDAVITS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.