Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Alvarez-Ortiz, Maria Individually, And On Behalf Of A.A., A Minor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Claudia Montani, against Kane, Sydney L., represented by John W Greenslade, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
1099 Statement Mailed c/o Maria Alvarez Ortiz c/o Maria Alvarez Ortiz Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Email sent to attorneys for Trust Fund Information Sheet requested Email sent to attorneys for Trust Fund Information Sheet requested Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Settled CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Nowak, Tom) Case Settled Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Prove Up (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Nowak, Tom)
Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment Letters to Attorneys Judgment Letters to Attorneys Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Ann/Appearance Case Settled CANCELED Trial Ann/Appearance (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Nowak, Tom) Case Settled Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report of Guardian Ad Litem Report Report of Guardian Ad Litem Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Order Appointing Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Agreed Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Judge: Nowak, Tom |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Re: Oral Deposition Re: Oral Deposition Judge: Nowak, Tom |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.