Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Debbie F Harrison filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Tijerina, Michael Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Fry, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Nisi - Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Receipt submitted to District Attorney NISI and Criminal Supervisor Queue Receipt submitted to District Attorney NISI and Criminal Supervisor Queue Judge: Fry, James |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Before the Court (1:30 PM) ()
Judge: Fry, James |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost - No Fee
Judge: Fry, James |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed Judgment Letter and Bill of Cost Judgment Letter and Bill of Cost Judge: Fry, James |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Letter Mailed And Bill of Cost And Bill of Cost Judge: Fry, James |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Sent documents to Criminal Supervisor and District Attorney - Nisi Queue Sent documents to Criminal Supervisor and District Attorney - Nisi Queue Judge: Fry, James |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment NISI Interest $
Judge: Fry, James |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Before the Court (1:30 PM) ()
Judge: Fry, James |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pass Slip and Notice to Appear Pass Slip and Notice of Bond Forfeiture Hearing Pass Slip and Notice of Bond Forfeiture Hearing Judge: Fry, James |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Notice Letter Notice Letter Judge: Fry, James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.