Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Old Other Civil Cases - District case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryOld Other Civil Cases - District |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ORDER TO DISMISS SIGNED ORDER TO DISMISS SIGNED |
|
March 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MOTION FOR DISMISSAL W/O PREJ MOTION FOR DISMISSAL W/O PREJ |
|
February 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion E-FILING CONV FEE FROM 021506 E-FILING CONV FEE FROM 021506 |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion NOT OF SUBMISSION NOT OF SUBMISSION |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DEFAULT ORD GRNT FORECLOSURE-SD DEFAULT ORD GRNT FORECLOSURE-SD |
|
February 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MTN FOR DFLT ORDER MTN FOR DFLT ORDER |
|
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ADDITIONAL $37 ADDITIONAL $37 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion $37 DUE JUD SUPP FEE $37 DUE JUD SUPP FEE |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion APPL FOR EXPEDITED FORECLOSURE APPL FOR EXPEDITED FORECLOSURE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.