Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Insight Business Consulting, Llc, Precise Benefit Services, Llc, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases case represented by Noah H Nadler, against Rha Insurance Services Consulting Group, Inc., Simplan Administrators, Inc., represented by Jason R. Jobe, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Roach, John R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2020 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Nonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Non-Suit CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Roach, John R., Jr.) Non-Suit Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed Order of Nonsuit Order of Nonsuit Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mailed NON to all parties NON to all parties Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address By Counsel for Plaintiffs Notice Notice of Change of Address By Counsel for Plaintiffs Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Fee Paid $40.00
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendants' Original Answer and Request for Disclosure Defendants' Original Answer and Request for Disclosure Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $371.00
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Simplan Administrators, Inc. Unserved RHA Insurance Services Consulting Group, Inc. Unserved
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00
Judge: Roach, John R., Jr. |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA) $308.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.