Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Peterson, Amanda C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Peterson, Mark C, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Henderson, Curt B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenderson, Curt B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryOld - Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order To Modify Parent Child Relationship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies $
Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies $
Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Copies $
Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certified Green Card Returned Evergreen Alliance Golf 11-15-2010 Evergreen Alliance Golf 11-15-2010 Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Issued Employer's Withholding Order
Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Mailed to Employer to Employer Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request for Employer's Withholding $15.00
Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Austin Form Mailed Mailed Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Withholding Employer Order to Withhold from Earnings for Child Support Employer Order to Withhold from Earnings for Child Support Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Agreement Reached CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Henderson, Curt B.) Agreement Reached Judge: Henderson, Curt B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.