Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moffatt, Robert, Moffatt, Patricia, Martinez, Adam R, Ii, Brewer, David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Martinez, Tonya M, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Tucker, Angela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTucker, Angela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryOld - Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder To Modify Parent Child Relationship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party and Change of Payee of Attorney General as Necessary Party and Change of Payee Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Austin Form mailed mailed Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mailed Copies to Mark Montgomery extra copies of order. to Mark Montgomery extra copies of order. Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Tucker, Angela)
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Requested Setting CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Tucker, Angela) Requested Setting 10/07/2013 Reset by Court to 10/28/2013 Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
October 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sign Order In Suit to Modify Parent Child Relationship to Sign Order In Suit to Modify Parent Child Relationship Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
General Docket Entry Parties appeared with counsel. Court heard argument. Child will continue to reside with Adam Martinez. Mother will have an expanded SPO. - AMT Parties appeared with counsel. Court heard argument. Child will continue to reside with Adam Martinez. Mother will have an expanded SPO. - AMT Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial Before the Court (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Tucker, Angela) 4 hours per side.; 06/10/2013 Reset by Court to 07/30/2013 4 hours per side.; Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter from court regarding mediation from court regarding mediation Judge: Tucker, Angela |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.