Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryTax Cases - District |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MOTION TO DISMISS APP/TAX WARRANT MOTION TO DISMISS APP/TAX WARRANT |
|
June 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion ORDER AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL OF TAX WRRNT ORDER AUTHORIZING DISMISSAL OF TAX WRRNT |
|
May 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion MONEY PAID FOR TAX SUIT MONEY PAID FOR TAX SUIT |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Conversion DOCKET SHEET DOCKET SHEET |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion TAX WARRANT SIGNED TAX WARRANT SIGNED |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conversion TAX SUITS/NO MONEY RECEIVED TAX SUITS/NO MONEY RECEIVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.