Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Russo, Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Howard D Hamilton, Jr., against Yan, Kieyun, represented by Troy D Walker, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts with Tucker, Angela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Undeliverable
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mailed or Faxed or Emailed Order Order of Dismissal Order of Dismissal Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Tucker, Angela)
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter Mediator's Correspondence to Judge Mediator's Correspondence to Judge Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Business Records Submission of Affidavits Submission of Affidavits Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant Kieyun Yan's Original Answer, Jury Demand, Rule 193.7 Notice and First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff Defendant Kieyun Yan's Original Answer, Jury Demand, Rule 193.7 Notice and First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Fee Paid $40.00
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Yan, Kieyun Unserved
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation $8.00
Judge: Tucker, Angela |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition Judge: Tucker, Angela |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.