Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Markarian, Michael D., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Matt Duke, against Fritchie, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Collin County, TX, . Collin County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 5.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/ Debt |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCollin County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 5 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service 4/8/2024 | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Fritchie, Chris Served 04/08/2024 Returned 04/10/2024 | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Served through E-Filing Portal Envelope # 86185935 Envelope # 86185935 |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Fritchie, Chris Unserved | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request Letter to Request Issuance of Citation Letter to Request Issuance of Citation |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Citation Pre Judgment | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Clerk Notes Waiting on payment to issue citation Waiting on payment to issue citation |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Contract Consumer/Commer/Debt (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.