Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garza, Ismael, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against H.E. Butt Grocery Company, in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, TX, . Cameron County, TX Superior Courts with Euresti, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCameron County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion
Date: June 23, 2021Citation Issued
Date: June 02, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: July 21, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: June 25, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: July 22, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: November 02, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 03, 2021Notice
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: November 12, 2021Motion
Date: June 03, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: August 11, 2022Suggestion of Death Filed (OCA)
Date: September 07, 2022Order to Abate (OCA)
Date: March 23, 2022Correspondence from 13th Court of Appeals
Date: March 08, 2022Correspondence from 13th Court of Appeals
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: November 15, 2021Official Notice from the Supreme Court
Date: March 28, 2022Exhibits
Date: June 03, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: August 11, 2022Exhibits
Date: June 03, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: June 07, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: July 19, 2022Notice of Delivery
Date: October 10, 2022Scheduling Order
Date: December 09, 2021Order
Date: September 02, 2021Response
Date: August 09, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: June 25, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: June 23, 2021Efiled Original Petition Document
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Euresti, Benjamin, Jr. |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Announcement
Judge: Euresti, Benjamin, Jr. |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Costs Adjudged | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Active Civil/Family (OCA) | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Judge: Garza, Robert |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry DCC held. Jury trial set for August 28, 2023 with announcements on August 22, 2023 both @ 8:30 am. Mandatory mediation to be completed by July 28, 2023. DCO to be submitted by Luis Solis w/Carla Saenz |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference (telephonic)
Judge: Euresti, Benjamin, Jr. |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery RE: SOUTH HEART CLINIC (MEDICAL AND RADIOLOGY) Notice of Delivery |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery RE: DR. STEPHANIE H. GARCIA (MEDICAL AND RADIOLOGY) Notice of Delivery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.