Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marceau, Georgia, Marceau, Raymond, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2009 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) 522160-Receipt of Distribution Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTION [522160] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 513610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [513610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing 511110-Hearing: Petition; Estate of Marceau, George E. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order 514210-Order Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner ORDER [514210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Accounting 522170-Waiver of Accounting Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING [522170] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 512920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner NOTICE OF HEARING [512920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration 513310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner DECLARATION [513310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisal 522230-Inventory and Appraisal Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL [522230] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition 512114-Petition: Subsequent Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner PETITION: SUBSEQUENT [512114] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order 514210-Order Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner ORDER [514210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.