Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilson Yudesis, Donna J., Yudesis, Benjamin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ford Motor Company, in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, TX, . Cameron County, TX Superior Courts with Leal, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCameron County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice
Date: October 18, 2021Objection
Date: October 18, 2021Notice
Date: October 18, 2021Response
Date: October 19, 2021Order
Date: November 02, 2021Amended Petition
Date: October 19, 2021Motion
Date: October 28, 2021Amended Petition
Date: August 30, 2021Amended Petition
Date: December 17, 2020Efiled Original Petition Document
Date: February 17, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: April 20, 2020Motion
Date: October 11, 2021Motion
Date: October 11, 2021Rule 11 Agreement
Date: July 28, 2020Motion
Date: October 12, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: October 12, 2021Service Return
Date: February 27, 2020Cover Letter - Request
Date: February 17, 2020Service Return
Date: February 24, 2020Exhibits
Date: February 17, 2020Civil Case Information Sheet
Date: February 17, 2020Original Answer
Date: March 09, 2020Request
Date: March 16, 2020Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: March 16, 2020Original Answer
Date: March 16, 2020Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: March 26, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 26, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 06, 2020Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions
Date: May 04, 2020Notice
Date: May 01, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 31, 2020Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions
Date: May 07, 2020Certificate of Deposition
Date: June 08, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: July 21, 2020Original Answer
Date: December 21, 2020Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 28, 2020Notice
Date: April 01, 2021Certificate of Deposition
Date: July 28, 2020Notice of Intention to take Deposition by Written Questions
Date: December 22, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 13, 2021Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: April 12, 2021Notice
Date: April 01, 2021Notice
Date: April 01, 2021Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: September 09, 2021Notice
Date: September 08, 2021Motion
Date: September 10, 2021Exhibits
Date: September 10, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 27, 2021Cover Letter - Request
Date: September 10, 2021Response
Date: September 22, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021Motion
Date: October 11, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021Request
Date: October 11, 2021Brief
Date: October 11, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021Notice
Date: October 11, 2021E-Filed Order
Date: October 18, 2021Response
Date: October 12, 2021Objection
Date: October 18, 2021Response
Date: October 18, 2021Exhibits
Date: October 22, 2021Answer
Date: October 29, 2021Reporter's Certification Deposition Of:
Date: January 13, 2022Answer
Date: April 29, 2022Exhibits
Date: May 02, 2022Notice
Date: October 22, 2021Exhibits
Date: May 02, 2022Exhibits
Date: May 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing
Judge: Leal, Janet |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Costs Adjudged | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Agreed Order of Dismissal signed. JLL/jm |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Agreed Order of Dismissal Judge: Leal, Janet |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Agreed Joint Motion to Dismiss |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Status Hearing Judge: Leal, Janet |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Order Setting Status Hearing signed. JLL/jm |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing
Judge: Leal, Janet |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Agreed Take Nothing Judgment signed. JLL/jm |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney's Agreement to Reset 11/29/22 Status Conference Rule 11 Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.