Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Montoya, Claudia, Montoya, Danielle Nicole, Montoya, Denise Renee, Montoya, Hermina Lisa, Montoya, Lydia Maria, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Dignity Memorial Network, Inc, Sci Management, Lp, Sci Shared Resources, Llc, Sci Texas Funeral Services, Llc F K A Sci Texas Funeral Services, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Cameron County, TX, . Cameron County, TX Superior Courts with Euresti, Benjamin, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2018 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCameron County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion
Date: December 18, 2018Service Return
Date: August 31, 2018Order
Date: February 21, 2019Motion
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Appeal
Date: February 27, 2019Response
Date: February 19, 2019Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 05, 2019Attachment
Date: February 27, 2019Response
Date: April 03, 2019Correspondence
Date: January 15, 2021Original Answer
Date: September 21, 2018Amended Original Answer
Date: October 22, 2018Exhibits
Date: April 03, 2019Exhibits
Date: April 04, 2019Amended Petition
Date: August 23, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: December 20, 2018Exhibits
Date: February 19, 2019Request
Date: February 27, 2019Request
Date: February 27, 2019Request
Date: March 05, 2019Request
Date: March 04, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 27, 2019Request
Date: August 27, 2019Motion
Date: February 19, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 29, 2021Order
Date: February 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Close Account 9214 8901 0661 5400 0179 2462 29
Judge: Euresti, Benjamin, Jr. |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Costs Adjudged | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Received check from Atlas, Hall, & Rodriguez LLP, a total amount $19,453.72 to be deposited in the Registry of the Court for O.O.M., a minor. Sent check to Texas Regional Bank to initiate account for minor as per Judgement. |
|
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Received check from Atlas, Hall, & Rodriguez LLP, a total amount $19,453.72 to be deposited in the Registry of the Court for H.L.M., a minor. Sent check to Texas Regional Bank to initiate account for minor as per Judgement. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Judgment submitted. |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filed Order Judgment |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing
Judge: Euresti, Benjamin, Jr. |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence from Antnony P. Troiani | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Both sides present; testimony presented-FRIENDLY SUIT-GRANTED. |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Journal Entry Both sides present; testimony presented, FRIENDLY SUIT-GRANTED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.