Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Fratis Pointer Cs I, Dba Flats On 12, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Dinwiddie, Lyndrick, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts Precinct 3 with Hill, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2024 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HousePrecinct 3 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Eviction | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss eFiled | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Forcible Detainer | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
February 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition eFiled | |
February 03, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.