Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bush, Christopher Robert, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hill, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Comment | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-trial Disposition | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Comment | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial Requested | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.