Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Neely, Davrion Rachelle, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Matzke, Amanda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL - RETURN RECEIPT | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAILED (MISC. CERTIFIED MAILED) | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL - RETURN RECEIPT | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL - RETURN RECEIPT | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAILED (MISC. CERTIFIED MAILED) | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ISSUED | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued-OCA | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.