Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ryan, William Maxwell, represented by Powell, Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Matzke, Amanda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Paper Packet | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Status of Attorney | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Form | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment/Status of Attorney | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | WARNING BY MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.