Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hernandez, Edgar Uriel, represented by Cune, Brad, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Swan, Misty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSwan, Misty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Waiver of Extradition | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Conditions of Community Supervision | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreed Discovery | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Conditions of Community Supervision | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.