Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williams, Earl Ray, represented by Hernandez, Daniel R., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Deadline | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Reset | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Reset | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | WARNING BY MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.