Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dubroc, Antonio Dwone, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Form | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | STATES MOTION | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL MISC. | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Reset | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment/Status of Attorney | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Form | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL MISC. | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.