Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rainey, Ivoryione Lashae, represented by Myles, Prince J., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Deadline | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Reset |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.