Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Amanda Alford Urban Inter Vivos Trust, Gonzalez, Anna Cecilia, James, Ralph, Tolle, Becky, Tolle, Scott, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fusco, Nick, Holt, Padon D., Prado, Eduardo, Smith, Stephen Ray, against Dws Development, Inc., Summit Crossing Owners Association, Inc., represented by Bettac, Nadia, Hester, Sean W, House, Robert A, Watson, J. Davis, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY VACATION LETTER | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.