Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mendez, Roy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mccormick, William Cagney, Steffey, Brandon, against Amguard Insurance Company, Telg, Matthew Tramell, represented by Makowski, Chester J., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hilburn, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
December 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO QUASH - SERVES FOR ALL | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REPORTERS CERTIFICATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.